This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 07:32:16 (UTC).

Gene Balsom v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Gene Balsom filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00472

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gene Balsom

Defendants

Chattem, Inc.

Sanofi US Services, Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline, LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Angelo

Attorney at Angelo and White

450 Newport Center Drive Suite 420

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Sara Louise Escalante

Attorney at Angelo and White APC

610 Newport Center Drive Suite 1200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Conditional Transfer Order - 59 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. and Sanofi US Services, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom, (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30903954 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Attorney Joseph Angelo added to party Gene Balsom(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Florida, 9:21-cv-80702 filed 4/13/2021. (iv) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Conditional Transfer Order - 59 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. and Sanofi US Services, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom, (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30903954 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Gene Balsom. (Attorney Joseph Angelo added to party Gene Balsom(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant