This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 07:32:28 (UTC).

Balmuccino LLC v. Starbucks Corporation

Case Summary

On October 21, 2022, Balmuccino, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Joel B. Ard of ARD Law Group PLLC, filed a contract lawsuit against Starbucks Corporation (“Defendant”), seeking damages with restitution for alleged breach of contract by, amongst other things, releasing coffee-flavored lip balms in 2019 without Plaintiff’s consent and without compensating Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Beginning in approximately 2016, Plaintiff, through its managing members, began developing a line of coffee-flavored lip balms.”

The plaintiff further stated, “In late 2017, including a meeting on October 19, 2017, Plaintiff spoke to and met with Defendant’s agents to discuss a joint venture associated with the production of the coffee-flavored lip balms developed by Plaintiff. During these conversations and meetings, it was understood and otherwise implied that if Defendant utilized Plaintiff’s ideas and concepts associated with the coffee-flavored lip balms, that Plaintiff would be duly compensated and given proper credit.”

The plaintiff also stated, “With the disclosed intent of creating a joint venture to manufacture and sell a line of coffee-flavor lip balms, Plaintiff provided to Defendant substantial and secret information associated with this line of coffee-flavored lips balms, including a pitch deck, fully realized prototypes, identification of suppliers and materials, explanations of the results of research and development efforts, trial and error results, marketing ideas, market data, all for the Plaintiff’s product line.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Rather than use this information for its intended purpose – i.e. to assess the potential joint venture or to actually begin working towards the manufacturing of the coffee-flavored lip balms with just compensation to Plaintiff – Defendant improperly used this information to manufacture its own line of coffee-flavored lip balms in approximately 2019 without compensating Plaintiff.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant was aware of its obligation to limit the use of Plaintiff’s ideas and work product to only evaluate Plaintiff’s ideas or to otherwise develop those ideas as a joint venture and with just compensation to Plaintiff. The fact that Defendant intentionally used Plaintiff’s ideas and work product to its own pecuniary advantage in developing and distributing for use its own branded lip balms in 2019 constitutes a breach of the confidential relationship between Plaintiff and Defendant.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “In other words, Defendant effectively stole Plaintiff’s product and has begun the manufacturing and sale of that product without compensating Plaintiff. Plaintiff had delivered a fully realized product concept to Defendant in a branded, pocketable lip balm delivery mechanism, along with fully formulated samples that smelled and tasted like the flavors of Defendant’s beverages. Subsequent to that meeting, Defendant improperly misappropriated this confidential information it obtained.”

The plaintiff presented four claims for relief, including alleged breach of implied-in-fact contract, breach of oral contract, breach of confidence, and trade secret misappropriation.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested an award of general, special, and punitive damages; damages for loss of past, present, and future economic losses; reasonable royalty and/or disgorgement of unjustly earned monies for Defendant’s trade secret misappropriation; and pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01501

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Fricke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Balmuccino LLC

Defendant

Starbucks Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel B Ard

Attorney at ARD LAW GROUP PLLC

Po Box 11633

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Eduardo Martorell

Attorney at MARTORELL LAW APC

6100 Center Dr, Ste 1130

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Starbucks Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7749326) Attorney Joel B Ard added to party Balmuccino, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Balmuccino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Plaintiff Balmuccino LLC, by and through undersigned counsel, states that Balmuccino is a Limited Liability Corporation incorporated under the laws of the state of California. Balmuccino has no parent corporation and no publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of its stock. Balmuccinos members are Samantha Lemole, Meredith Scott Lynn, Faith Miller, and Vincent Spinnato. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Balmuccino, LLC (Ard, Joel) Modified on 10/25/2022 to add affiliates. (RE) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eduardo Martorell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Balmuccino, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7749359 (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Starbucks, Inc. by Plaintiff Balmuccino, LLC (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Starbucks Corporation. (RE) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2023, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2023, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Starbucks Corporation. (RE) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketJudge Theresa L Fricke added. (RE) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement: Added affiliate names. (RE) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eduardo Martorell for Plaintiff Balmuccino, LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Starbucks, Inc. by Plaintiff Balmuccino, LLC (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eduardo Martorell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Balmuccino, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7749359 (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Plaintiff Balmuccino LLC, by and through undersigned counsel, states that Balmuccino is a Limited Liability Corporation incorporated under the laws of the state of California. Balmuccino has no parent corporation and no publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of its stock. Balmuccinos members are Samantha Lemole, Meredith Scott Lynn, Faith Miller, and Vincent Spinnato. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Balmuccino, LLC (Ard, Joel) Modified on 10/25/2022 to add affiliates. (RE) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Starbucks Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7749326) Attorney Joel B Ard added to party Balmuccino, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Balmuccino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ard, Joel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less