This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 09:14:15 (UTC).

Ballatore v. LaFontaine Volkswagen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Ballatore filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LaFontaine Volkswagen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-12909

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin Ballatore

Defendants

LaFontaine Volkswagen, Inc.

Community Choice Credit Union

Capital One, National Association

Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

Zeal Credit Union

Bank of America, N.A.

Keybank National Association

Our Credit Union

Santander Consumer USA Inc.

Ally Bank

Michigan State University Federal Credit Union

Citizens Bank

TD Auto Finance LLC

Genisys Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam G. Taub

Attorney at Adam Taub Assoc Consumer Law Group

17200 W. Ten Mile Road Suite 200

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Holzman

Attorney at Holzman Law, PLLC

28366 Franklin Road

Southfield, MI 48034

Michael V. Krempa

Attorney at Holzman Law, PLLC

28366 Franklin Rd.

Southfield, MI 48034

Matthew O. Stromquist

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 North Clark Street, 26Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Justin Wade Dixon

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 North Laura Street, Ste 3900

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Amy Sabbota Gottlieb

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

2600 West Big Beaver Rd., Suite 300

Troy, MI 48084

Micah Rogalski

Attorney at Bush Seyferth PLLC

100 W. Big Beaver Rd, Ste #400, Troy

Troy, MI 48084

Erica J. Shell

Attorney at Bodman, PLC

6Th Floor At Ford Field, 1901 St. Antoine

Detroit, MI 48226

Steven A. Morris

Attorney at Simon PLC Attorneys & Counselors

37000 Woodward Ave, Suite 250

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Citizens Bank identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Bank for Citizens Bank. (Morris, Steven) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Capital One National Association to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint, ( Responsive Pleading due by 1/15/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Capital One, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, National Association. (Stromquist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew O. Stromquist on behalf of Capital One, National Association. (Stromquist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Keybank National Association identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for Keybank National Association. (Rogalski, Micah) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Bank of America to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 1/16/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Santander Consumer USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc. for Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Shell, Erica) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant KeyBank National Association to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 1/16/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Community Choice Credit Union, Zeal Credit Union, Our Credit Union, Michigan State University Federal Credit Union, and Genisys Credit Union to Answer #3 Amended Complaint, ( Responsive Pleading due by 1/16/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Krempa on behalf of Community Choice Credit Union, Genisys Credit Union, Michigan State University Federal Credit Union, Our Credit Union, Zeal Credit Union. (Krempa, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Holzman on behalf of Community Choice Credit Union, Genisys Credit Union, Michigan State University Federal Credit Union, Our Credit Union, Zeal Credit Union. (Holzman, Charles) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica J. Shell on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Shell, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation, Other Affiliate Toyota Financial Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Toyota Financial Services International Corporation for Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Dixon, Justin) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Wade Dixon on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Dixon, Justin) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kristin Ballatore against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Taub, Adam) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kristin Ballatore against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8135949 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OUR CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where GENISYS CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITIZENS BANK N A is a litigant