This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 10:52:26 (UTC).

Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Ballas Nails Spa, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette A. Baker and Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01155

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nannette A. Baker

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC

Defendant

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D. Molner

Attorney at MOLNER LAW FIRM LLC

300 E. 39Th St., Suite 1G

Kansas City, MO 64111

Taylor Kosla

Attorney at AGRUSS LAW FIRM LLC

4809 N. Ravenswood Ave., Suite 419

Chicago, IL 60640

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen O. Clancy

Attorney at ROBINSON AND COLE LLP

280 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103

Gregory Paul Varga

Attorney at ROBINSON AND COLE LLP

280 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103

Nicholas Anthony Cammarata

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

23 #3

Exhibit C

23 #2

Exhibit B

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE Non-Opposition and Withdrawal of Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs: by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC re #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#13

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC Process Server: Connecticut Process Serving, LLC (Molner, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC.. (Molner, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees ; ORDERED GRANTED by agreement [see entry # 22]. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/22/20. (CDP) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE Non-Opposition and Withdrawal of Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs: by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC re #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kosla, Taylor) filed by Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/14/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory P. Varga. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8191186) by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory P. Varga)(Varga, Gregory) filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, AND #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen Clancy. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8191213) by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Clancy)(Clancy, Stephen) filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/6/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen Clancy. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8191213) by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Clancy)(Clancy, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory P. Varga. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8191186) by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory P. Varga)(Varga, Gregory) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Molner, Mark) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CJRA ORDER. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. (EAB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (EAB) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Mark D. Molner. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC Process Server: Connecticut Process Serving, LLC (Molner, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC.. (Molner, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America with receipt number AMOEDC-8104462, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Ballas Nails & Spa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Molner, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C) (BAK). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Molner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor L Kosla