This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 10:09:34 (UTC).

Ballard v. Harsch & Osborne, M.D., P.C.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Ballard filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Harsch Osborne, M D , P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell G. Vineyard and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candace Ballard

Defendant

Harsch & Osborne, M.D., P.C. doing business as Southeastern Primary Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus G. Keegan

Attorney at Keegan Law Firm, LLC

1827 Powers Ferry Road Se, Building 25, Suite 100, 30339

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Harsch & Osborne, M.D., P.C. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10106936) filed by Candace Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Harsch & Osborne, M.D., P.C. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10106936) filed by Candace Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less