This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 08:33:50 (UTC).

Baldwin v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Baldwin filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Gary L. Sharpe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Gary L. Sharpe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kalonie Baldwin

Defendants

Department of Veterans Affairs

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey K. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson, Moschetti Law Firm

26 Century Hill Drive, Suite 206

Latham, NY 12110

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/22/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

2 #2

Summons for Department of Veterans Affairs

2 #1

Summons for U.S. Attorney General

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons for Department of Veterans Affairs)(see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-5043401) filed by Kalonie Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/22/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons for Department of Veterans Affairs)(see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-5043401) filed by Kalonie Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less