This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:20:55 (UTC).

Baldwin v. Boeing Company

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Baldwin filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Boeing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Solomon Oliver, Jr and Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02400

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Solomon Oliver, Jr

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heidi M Baldwin

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Square D Company

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Ford Motor Company

Boeing Company

United Technologies Corporation

General Electric Corporation

Ericsson, Inc.

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Corporation

FCA US LLC

Rockwell Automation

Viacom

Curtis-Wright Corporation

John Does

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division

Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Honeywell International, Inc.

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Kelley

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Brian R. Herberth

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

John M. Murphy

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Joyce Chambers Reichard

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Shawn M. Acton

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Edward J. Kelley, III

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jenifer E. Novak

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Edward O. Patton

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Susan Squire Box

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress - Akron

222 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

David E. Oeschger

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress - Akron

222 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Matthew C. O'Connell

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Nathan F. Studeny

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

James M. Lyons, Jr.

Attorney at Hanna, Campbell & Powell

3737 Embassy Parkway

Akron, OH 44333

Tiffany L. Poirier

Attorney at Hanna, Campbell & Powell

3737 Embassy Parkway

Akron, OH 44333

Melanie M. Irwin

Attorney at Willman & Silvaggio

5500 Corporate Drive

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Sarena M. Holder

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Melanie M. Irwin

Attorney at Willman & Silvaggio

5500 Corporate Drive

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Other Attorneys

Daniel J. Michalec

Attorney at Burns White - Cleveland

1350 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Kevin C. Alexandersen

Attorney at Burns White - Cleveland

1350 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Christopher J. Caryl

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

James L. McCrystal, Jr.

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

44 #1

Exhibit A Amended Answer

#44

6 #2

Exhibit B

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Preliminary Product ID and Work History Disclosure

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Attorney Appearance by James M. Lyons, Jr filed by on behalf of Ericsson, Inc.. (Lyons, James) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Attorney Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen , Daniel J. Michalec and Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Doran, Perry) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ford Motor Company. (Box, Susan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Attorney Appearance by Susan Squire Box filed by on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Box, Susan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Motion for leave to Amend Answer (Related Doc #44 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/12/2019.(L,Ja) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Motion for leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Patton, Edward) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Boeing Company. (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion United Technologies Corporation's Joinder in Defenant the Boeing Company's Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Answer of Defendant United Technologies Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Preliminary Product Identification and Work History Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of John C. Sumner in Support of Defendant United Technologies Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action, #5 Exhibit E, Declaration of William P. Ringo PH.D., CIH, in Support of Defendant United Technologies Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action)(Manno, Joseph) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (K,AR). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Manno filed by on behalf of United Technologies Corporation. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketJudge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (B,R) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate State Street Bank & Trust Company, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Boeing Company filed by Boeing Company(Successor-in-Interest and/or Liability to The Douglas Aircraft Company). (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Boeing Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-921269 Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9574206. Filed by Boeing Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Product ID and Work History Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division is a litigant

Latest cases where CURTISS-WRIGHT FLOW CONTROL CORP (DOE 4) is a litigant

Latest cases where SQUARE D COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lockheed Martin Corporation is a litigant