This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 15:54:44 (UTC).

Baldwin v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Baldwin filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-15644

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Baldwin

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC

ASTRAZENECA LP

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC.

TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EPHRAIM SAMUEL GEISLER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

17 East Main Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

PAUL J. PENNOCK

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFREY R. LILLY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Isaac J. Colunga

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP

200 West Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60606

Heather Lynn Maly

Attorney at Ice Miller

200 W Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60606

JEFFREY DANIEL GEOPPINGER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

KERRY CARSON GREEN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

LISA MARLO KUHNELL

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC. (LILLY, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. PENNOCK on behalf of Terry Baldwin (PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by LISA MARLO KUHNELL on behalf of THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY (KUHNELL, LISA) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#17

(#17) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#15

(#15) TRANSFERRED to the New Jersey the electronic record.(nsf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#7

(#7) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/3/19. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP by Isaac J. Colunga (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L006015) filed by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15989668. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC. (LILLY, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. PENNOCK on behalf of Terry Baldwin (PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by LISA MARLO KUHNELL on behalf of THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY (KUHNELL, LISA) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 7/19/19 from the Northern District of Illinois 1:19-cv-4438 for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TRANSFERRED to the New Jersey the electronic record.(nsf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2789 Conditional Transfer Order filed 07/18/2019. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP by Heather Lynn Maly (Maly, Heather) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/3/19. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (cc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP by Isaac J. Colunga (Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L006015) filed by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15989668. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Colunga, Isaac) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II) is a litigant