This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2020 at 18:55:03 (UTC).

Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Baldwin filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Lockheed Martin Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02407

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heidi M. Baldwin, Executrix of the Estate of Dorothy R. Grossholz, Deceased

Defendants

Square D Company

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Ford Motor Company

The Boeing Company and its Boeing Integrated Defense Systems Division as Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation

United Technologies Corporation

The Boeing Company, Successor in Interest and/or Liability to the Douglas Aircraft Company

Rockwell Automation, As Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Corporation

Rockwell Automation, Inc., Successor-in-interest to Allen-Bradley Co.

Curtis-Wright Corporation

Ericsson, Inc.

General Electric Corporation

Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division

FCA US LLC and its Alfa Romeo Division

Westinghouse Electric Corporation, aka Viacom

Pneumo Abex Corporation

Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Edward O. Patton

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jeffrey M. Embleton

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Susan Squire Box

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress - Akron

222 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Julian T. Emerson

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

Nathan F. Studeny

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

James M. Lyons, Jr.

Attorney at Hanna, Campbell & Powell

3737 Embassy Parkway

Akron, OH 44333

Tiffany L. Poirier

Attorney at Hanna, Campbell & Powell

3737 Embassy Parkway

Akron, OH 44333

Ryan T. Winkler

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Christopher J. Caryl

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Other Attorneys

John M. Murphy

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Joyce Chambers Reichard

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Daniel J. Michalec

Attorney at Burns White - Cleveland

1350 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Sarena M. Holder

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Brooke L. Hamilton

Attorney at Burns White - Cleveland

1350 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Jenifer E. Novak

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Brian P. Kelley

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Kevin C. Alexandersen

Attorney at Burns White - Cleveland

1350 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Shawn M. Acton

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Colleen C. Murnane

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Brian R. Herberth

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Order The complaint in the above captioned case and Case No. 1:19-cv-02407 Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al., involve common issues of fact and law. In accordance with Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate the above captioned case with Case No. 1:19-cv-02400 in the interest of convenience of the parties and economy in judicial administration. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:19-cv-02400. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/1/2019. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#32

(#32) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#31

(#31) Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Finer filed by on behalf of United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

30 #1

Pleading Separate Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company

#5

(#5) Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/21/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#49

(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#48

(#35) Attorney Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen , Daniel J. Michalec and Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

44 #2

Exhibit B Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer

44 #1

Exhibit A Amended Answer

#44

(#34) Motion for leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Patton, Edward) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 State Court docket

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's Preliminary Product Identification and Work History D

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Plaintiff's Responses to First Amended CDR

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Baldwin Complaint

#1

(#6) Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Holder, Sarena) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Attorney Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen , Daniel J. Michalec and Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Motion for leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Patton, Edward) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Order The complaint in the above captioned case and Case No. 1:19-cv-02407 Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al., involve common issues of fact and law. In accordance with Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate the above captioned case with Case No. 1:19-cv-02400 in the interest of convenience of the parties and economy in judicial administration. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:19-cv-02400. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/1/2019. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Finer filed by on behalf of United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Motion for leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Separate Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company)(O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord Corporation for Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell and Nathan F. Studeny filed by on behalf of Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Holder, Sarena) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/21/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Notice to Attorney Daniel M. Finer. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV19921269 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9575851.. Filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Baldwin Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff's Responses to First Amended CDR, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's Preliminary Product Identification and Work History Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court docket) (Patton, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.