This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 23:48:09 (UTC).

Baldwin et al v. Blackground-Interscope Records, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Baldwin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blackground-Interscope Records, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08923

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Audrey Ducasse

New York, NY 10152

Kevin Baldwin

Kevin Baldwin doing business as M.O.P3

Defendants

Blackground-Interscope Records, LLC

Audrey Ducasse

New York, NY 10152

Interscope Records, Inc.

Rule #1 Music Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lita Teresa Rosario

Attorney at Lita Rosario, PLLC

529 14Th St Nwsuite 952

Washington, DC 20045

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Stephen Mandel

Attorney at Cowan, Liebowitz & Latman, P.C.

114 West 47Th Street

New York, NY 10036

Jonathan David Davis

Attorney at Jonathan D.Davis, P.C.

10 Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1015

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#78

#67

#36

#26

#88

#87

#86

#85

#84

#83

#82

#81

#80

79 #1

Exhibit Aff. of Attempted Service

79 #79

Main Document

#77

#76

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Audrey Ducasse p/k/a Melii, issued July 29, 2021.(dt) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Rule #1 Music, Inc., issued July 29, 2021.(dt) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) DECLARATION of Lita Rosario, Esq. Plaintiff's counsel in Support re: #84 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) DECLARATION of Lita Rosario, Esq. Plaintiff's counsel in Support re: #83 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Rosario, Lita. DO NOT RE-FILE Document No. #83 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, #84 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Did not separately file an Affidavit or Declaration in Support of the Clerk's Certificate of Default. Refer to ECF Rule 16.1. When filing use event type either a Declaration or Affidavit in Support of a Non-Motion, found under the event list Other Answers. (dt) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 7/29/2021 (dt). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 7/29/2021 (dt). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Audrey Ducasse served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Rule #1 Music Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. Service was accepted by Flo Gonzalez, Adminstrative Assistant. Document filed by Kevin Baldwin..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/15/2021. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lita Teresa Rosario to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct. The Cause of Action was omitted. Only ONE Nature of Suit may be selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lita Teresa Rosario. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $3,500,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lita Teresa Rosario. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Blackground-Interscope Records, LLC, Audrey Ducasse, Baldwin Kevin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosario, Lita) Modified on 9/26/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Blackground-Interscope Records, LLC, Audrey Ducasse. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17663490)Document filed by Baldwin Kevin.(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERSCOPE RECORDS A DIVISON OF UMG RECORDINGS INC AND TRAP ILLUSTRATED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lita Teresa Rosario