This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2022 at 07:36:09 (UTC).

Baldonado v. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Baldonado filed an Other lawsuit against Vivint Solar Developer, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00697

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adela Baldonado

Defendants

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC

Vivint Solar, Inc.

Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc.

Sunrun, Inc.

LOANPAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan M Warren

Attorney at Feferman, Warren & Mattison

300 Central Avenue Sw, Suite 2000 West

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Ryan Jones

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Manshukhani, LLP

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Charles R Hughson

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin, Robb, PA

P. O. Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Sunrun, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar, Inc. served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, civil cover sheet and judge assignment served on Loanpal, LLC on 9/26/22, filed by Adela Baldonado. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ryan Jones on behalf of Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc.. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#12

(#12) Defendant Goodleap, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by LOANPAL LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Adela Baldonado.(Hughson, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOANPAL LLC (Hughson, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Adela Baldonado.(Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#16

(#16) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 03:30 PM. Joint Status Report due by 12/09/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/25/2022. (cm) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 03:30 PM. Joint Status Report due by 12/09/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/25/2022. (cm) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Adela Baldonado.(Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #11 Motion for Extension. Defendants Vivint Solar Developer, LLC; Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc.; Vivint Solar, Inc.; and Sunrun, Inc. shall have until 11/03/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOANPAL LLC (Hughson, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant Goodleap, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by LOANPAL LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Adela Baldonado.(Hughson, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc.. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ryan Jones on behalf of Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, civil cover sheet and judge assignment served on Loanpal, LLC on 9/26/22, filed by Adela Baldonado. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar, Inc. served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Adela Baldonado voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Warren, Susan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Vivint Solar, Inc.. (jg) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Sunrun, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adela Baldonado. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LOANPAL LLC, Sunrun, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc., Vivint Solar, Inc.. (jg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8470861 re #1 Complaint filed by Adela Baldonado (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Adela Baldonado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Susan) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Holdings, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Vivint Solar Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNRUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LOANPAL LLC is a litigant