This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2021 at 07:28:39 (UTC).

Baldobino et al v. Chic-fil-A, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Baldobino filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Chic-fil-A, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01462

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hannah Baldobino

Victoria Kelly

Defendants

Chic-fil-A, Inc

KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc

KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc doing business as Chick-Fil-A/Walnut Avenue FSU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn Deutsch Levy

Attorney at Law Office of Glenn D. Levy

906 West Basse Road - Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78212

Defendant Attorneys

Clayton McCarthy Davis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Vanessa M. Garza

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Barry A. Moscowitz

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Jordan Paige Woody

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins and Irons LLP

700 North Pearl Street, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (FOR THE SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS/PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER) by Chic-fil-A, Inc, KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc. (Woody, Jordan) (Entered: 02/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in light of the amended motion (Dkt. # 10). Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kc5) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's new deadline for filing an answer or other responsive pleading is March 24, 2021. Defendant's new deadline for filing its Rule 7.1 disclosure statement is also March 24, 2021. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kc5) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Other Responsive Pleading and Disclosure Statement by Chic-fil-A, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garza, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Other Responsive Pleading and Disclosure Statement by Chic-fil-A, Inc. (Garza, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Chic-fil-A, Inc answer due 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Chic-fil-A, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Clayton) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFENDANT KandR RESTAURANT GROUP INC.S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Barry A. Moscowitz added to party KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc(pty:dft) by KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc.(Moscowitz, Barry) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Chic-fil-A, Inc. and KandR Restaraunt Group, Inc. (bc) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hannah Baldobino, Victoria Kelly. Summons KandR (Levy, Glenn) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hannah Baldobino, Victoria Kelly. Summons Chic=fil-A (Levy, Glenn) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14318772), filed by Hannah Baldobino, Victoria Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Glenn) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/29/2020) (bc). (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn Deutsch Levy