This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 07:40:06 (UTC).

Baldi-Perry v. Emerson Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Baldi-Perry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Emerson Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Sinatra, Jr. and Jeremiah J. McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

Referral Judge

Jeremiah J. McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Baldi-Perry

Defendants

Emerson Electric Company

Insinkerator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Donald Morath, Jr.

Attorney at Connors LLP

1000 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Defendant Attorney

Erin E Connare

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A (Complaint)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Service of Process)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Answer)

1 #4

Exhibit D (Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief)

1 #5

Exhibit E (Supplemental Demand for Relief)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Emerson Electric Company, Insinkerator re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff of E-Filing Notice of Removal (Connare, Erin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Electric Company, Insinkerator. (Connare, Erin) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Teleconference set for 6/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/31/2022. (EG) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.). Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 6/28/22. (MDY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2022. Counsel for the parties appear by telephone. Basic allegations of the case briefly discussed. Case Management Order (CMO) dates discussed and set. CMO to follow. The court instructs the parties that good cause must be shown to amend CMO dates. The court also informs the parties of its informal discovery dispute resolution procedures, and encourages them to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction over the case. APPEARANCES (by telephone): Andrew Debbins for plaintiff; Erin Connare for defendants (AT&T) (EG) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.). Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 6/28/22. (MDY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order)(Connare, Erin) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Teleconference set for 6/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/31/2022. (EG) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docket(#5) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/31/2022. (KLH) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Electric Company, Insinkerator. (Connare, Erin) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: All parties are expected to comply with Judge Sinatra's individual requirements set forth in the "Judges' Info" section of the Court's website. Business organization parties should pay particular attention to the tab relating to such parties. (KLH) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Emerson Electric Company, Insinkerator re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff of E-Filing Notice of Removal (Connare, Erin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Insinkerator, Emerson Electric Company from Supreme Court Erie County, case number 800979/2022. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4589493), filed by Insinkerator, Emerson Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Service of Process), #3 Exhibit C (Answer), #4 Exhibit D (Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief), #5 Exhibit E (Supplemental Demand for Relief), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connare, Erin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where InSinkErator is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant