This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 12:53:01 (UTC).

Balderas v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Balderas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-82312

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hector Balderas

Defendants

Chattem Inc.

Fred Meyer, Inc.

Appco Pharma LLC

Novitium Pharma LLC

Glaxosmithkline LLC

LANNETT COMPANY, INC.

Pfizer Inc

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.,

ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.

Walmart Inc

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Walgreens Co.

Target Corporation

Apotex Corp

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus J. Rael, Jr.

Attorney at Robles, Rael & Anaya, PC

500 Marquette Nw, Ste. 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Cholla Khoury

Attorney at New Mexico Attorney Genderal's Office

408 Galisteo Street

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Defendant Attorneys

Ilana Eisenstein

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1650 Market Street, Suite 5000

Philadelphia, PA 91903-7300

Daniel S. Pariser

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Paige H. Sharpe

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Anand Agneshwar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kay Schler LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Fredrick Howard Lebron McClure

Attorney at Trenam Law / Tampa

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 2700

Tampa, FL 33602-5150

Jordan Scott Cohen

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford

515 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1400 Suntrust Center

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Maura L. Burke

Attorney at Fox, Rothschild, LLP

2000 Market Street, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eileen Oakes Muskett

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1301 Atlantic Avenue, Midtown Building, Suite 400

Atlantic City, NJ 08401-7212

Allison L. Hollows

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

101 Park Avenue, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10178

Joseph G. Petrosinelli

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Annie E. Showalter

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Elyse Echtman

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019-6119

Megan B. Gramke

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-2409

John R. Ipsaro

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Sarah Elizabeth Johnston

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sarah M. Johnson

Attorney at Wyrick Robbins Yates & Ponton LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27607

Terry M. Henry

Attorney at Blank Rome, LLP

One Logan Square, 130 N. 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

Richard M. Barnes

Attorney at Goodell DeVries Leech & Gray

1 South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#108

#107

#4

103 #1

*Restricted*

#103

#102

#101

#100

#14

#8

#7

#6

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Remanding Case to: First Judicial District Court Santa Fe County Court House. State Court Case Number: 1:20-cv-00833 (mc) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ORDER granting (2649 in case 9:20-md-02924-RLR) Plaintiff the State of New Mexico's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/26/2021. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-82312-RLR. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#105) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Mexico. Case Number 1:20-cv-00833 with documents 1-102. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-82312-RLR on 12/16/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#104) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Case transferred in from New Mexico; Case Number 1:20-cv-00833. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) TRANSFER ORDER by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg (MDL 2924). (kg) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #14 MOTION to Stay Defendants filed by Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Defendants filed by Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Montano, Larry) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***FILED IN ERROR-ATTORNEY WILL BE FILING AN ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL COUNSEL***NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Barnes on behalf of Perrigo Research & Development Company (Barnes, Richard) Modified on 8/24/2020 (aek). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Petrosinelli on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Petrosinelli, Joseph ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Walmart Inc. Notice of Appearance by Larry J. Montano and Julia Broggi of Holland & Hart LLP on behalf of WalMart, Inc. (Montano, Larry) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek) Modified on 8/21/2020 (arp). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Rodriguez, Justin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7266075 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by STRIDES PHARMA, INC. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Crown, Ross) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STRIDES PHARMA, INC. from First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2020-01289. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Crown, Ross) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Novitium Pharma LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANNETT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant