This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 10:39:20 (UTC).

BALDASSANO et al v. SUNRUN INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 BALDASSANO filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SUNRUN INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02072

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCINE BALDASSANO

SUZANNE RAFAEL

Defendants

SUNRUN INC.

VIVINT SOLAR, INC.

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

CAMERON CATMULL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW M. MILZ

Attorney at FLITTER MILZ, P.C.

1814 East Route 70, Suite 350

Cherry Hill, NJ 08003

Defendant Attorney

VIRGINIA TRUNKES

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

One Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC., VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. SUNRUN INC. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. VIVINT SOLAR, INC. served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA TRUNKES on behalf of CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC., VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC. (TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC..(TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNRUN INC. identifying Sunrun Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#9

(#9) Order Initial Conference set for 7/26/2022 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/13/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Initial Conference set for 7/26/2022 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/13/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNRUN INC. identifying Sunrun Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC..(TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA TRUNKES on behalf of CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC., VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC. (TRUNKES, VIRGINIA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. VIVINT SOLAR, INC. served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCINE BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. SUNRUN INC. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC., VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CAMERON CATMULL, SUNRUN INC., VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13325886) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRANCINC BALDASSANO, SUZANNE RAFAEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNRUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant