On August 31, 2021, Tyler Baker (“Plaintiff”), individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Aarthi Manohar, Barbara Gibson, Craig W. Hillwig, Douglas A. Abrahams and William E. Hoese of Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C., Stephanie Egner Smith of Roberts Law Firm, P.A., Nathan J. Fink and David H. Fink of Fink Bressack, filed a personal property fraud liability lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. ("Walmart" or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory, injunctive and compensatory relief, along with pre-judgment interest, restitution and costs, for allegedly marketing and selling Baby Food Products without disclosing that they were tainted with ("Toxic Heavy Metals") at levels above what is considered safe for babies. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Arkansas with Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. presiding.
In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On February 4, 2021, the Subcommittee on Economic and Consumer Policy of the U.S. House of Representatives (the "Subcommittee") released a Report concluding that baby food manufacturers, including Walmart, sold Baby Food Products containing concentrations of inorganic arsenic, lead, cadmium, and mercury at levels above what is considered safe for babies.”
The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Walmart does not disclose the Toxic Heavy Metal content of its foods on its labels or in its marketing materials, nor does it warn consumers that its Baby Food Products may contain potentially dangerous levels of Toxic Heavy Metals.”
The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Plaintiff and the Class members purchased Baby Food Products manufactured and sold by Walmart, unaware that Walmart products potentially contain Toxic Heavy Metals at levels well above what is considered safe for babies. Had Walmart disclosed the Toxic Heavy Metal content on its product labels, or otherwise warned that its products could contain levels of Toxic Heavy Metals considered unsafe, neither Plaintiff nor any other reasonable consumer would have purchased Walmart's products.”
The Plaintiff lists out five claims for relief. The first claim alleged is for Breach of Express Warranty. The second claim alleged is for Breach of Implied Warranty. The third claim allege is for Unjust Enrichment. The fourth claim alleged is for the violation of Vermont Consumer Protection Act, and the fifth claim alleged is for the violation of Kentucky Consumer Protection Act.
In his prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an order certifying the Classes; an order finding in favor of Plaintiff and the Classes on all counts asserted herein; an order enjoining Walmart from selling Baby Food Products until the higher and/or unsafe levels of Toxic Heavy Metals are removed or full disclosure of the presence of Toxic Heavy Metals appears on all labels; require Walmart to engage in a corrective advertising campaign and engage in any further necessary affirmative injunctive relief, such as recalling existing products; for damages in amounts to be determined by the Court and/or jury, and prejudgment interest on all amounts awarded; further, for an order of restitution and all other forms of equitable monetary relief, and for an order awarding Plaintiff and the Classes costs of litigation.
This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.
3:21-CV-00182
08/31/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Personal Property Fraud
D. P. Marshall Jr.
Tyler Baker
Walmart Inc
Stephanie Egner Smith
Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.
Post Office Box 241790
Little Rock, AR 72223-1790
William E. Hoese
Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Aarthi Manohar
Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Barbara Gibson
Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Craig W. Hillwig
Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
David H. Fink
Attorney at Fink Bressack PLLC
38500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 350
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Douglas A. Abrahams
Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Nathan Joshua Fink
Attorney at Fink Bressack PLLC
38500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 350
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Civil Cover Sheet
(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Fink. Fee $100.00 received, Receipt Number LIT083843. Filed by Tyler Baker. (mdo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan J. Fink. Fee $100.00 received, Receipt Number LIT083843. Filed by Tyler Baker. (mdo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
(#5) STIPULATION Re: Service and Response to Complaint by Walmart Inc. (Powell, Meredith) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William E Hoese. Fee $100 receipt number LIT083943. Filed by Tyler Baker. (kth) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Douglas A Abrahams. Fee $100 receipt number LIT083944. Filed by Tyler Baker. (kth) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
Docket(#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Docs. #8 & #9 , granted. Mr. William E. Hoese and Mr. Douglas A. Abrahams are admitted pro hac vice. All future filings are to be made in the lead case 3:21-cv-82-DPM. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2021. (slb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Douglas A Abrahams. Fee $100 receipt number LIT083944. Filed by Tyler Baker. (kth) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William E Hoese. Fee $100 receipt number LIT083943. Filed by Tyler Baker. (kth) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Docs. #3 & #4 , granted. Mr. David H. Fink and Mr. Nathan J. Fink are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/4/2021. (slb) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Stipulation regarding service and response to complaint, Doc. #5 , noted and approved. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2021. (slb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) STIPULATION Re: Service and Response to Complaint by Walmart Inc. (Powell, Meredith) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan J. Fink. Fee $100.00 received, Receipt Number LIT083843. Filed by Tyler Baker. (mdo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Fink. Fee $100.00 received, Receipt Number LIT083843. Filed by Tyler Baker. (mdo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCases associated. Create association to 3:21-cv-00082-DPM pursuant to 2 Order. (jak) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Plaintiff noted on his civil cover sheet that this case is related to a pending consolidated matter about allegedly contaminated Wal-Mart baby food. Common questions of law and fact are presented. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2). The Court therefore consolidates this case with the lead case, 3:21-cv-82, on the terms specified in Doc. 25 in that case. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2021. (slb) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc filed by Tyler Baker. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083495.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
[-] Read Less