This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2020 at 09:05:02 (UTC).

Baker v. Shin Family LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Baker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Shin Family LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00682

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Baker

Defendant

Shin Family LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bonnie Nobuko Fong

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Conrad Reynoldson

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Bonnie Fong

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Jill Sulzberg

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Defendant Attorney

Jason J Hoeft

Attorney at EMERY REDDY

600 Stewart St, Ste 1100

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Brian Baker (Sulzberg, Jill) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/14/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason J Hoeft on behalf of Defendant Shin Family LLC. (Hoeft, Jason) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jill Sulzberg on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Sulzberg, Jill) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shin Family, LLC on 5/11/2020 5/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Terasaki, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct service date (PM). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Shin Family LLC (SG) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Shin Family LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6316741), filed by Brian Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reynoldson, Conrad) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Brian Baker (Sulzberg, Jill) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/14/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason J Hoeft on behalf of Defendant Shin Family LLC. (Hoeft, Jason) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jill Sulzberg on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Sulzberg, Jill) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: corrected service date from 5/11/2020 to 5/9/2020. (PM) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shin Family, LLC on 5/11/2020 5/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Terasaki, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct service date (PM). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Shin Family LLC (SG) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Shin Family LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6316741), filed by Brian Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reynoldson, Conrad) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less