This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:37:24 (UTC).

Baker v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Baker filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliastar Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Wier and Hanly A. Ingram. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

Referral Judge

Hanly A. Ingram

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Baker

Defendants

Reliastar Life Insurance Company

Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan

Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karl Cody Allison

Attorney at Cody Allison & Associates, PLLC

95 White Bridge Road, Suite 250

Nashville, TN 37205

Andrew Michael Hickman

Attorney at Cody Allison & Associates, PLLC

95 White Bridge Road, Suite 250

Nashville, TN 37205

Defendant Attorneys

Robyn L. Anderson

Attorney at Lathrop & Gage, LC - Kansas City

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

Ann Michelle Turner

Attorney at Turner, Keal & Button PLLC

10624 Meeting Street, Suite 101

Prospect, KY 40059

Leslie Goff Sanders

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. - TN

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robyn Anderson: Having determined that these filings meet the requirements in Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2, the Court HEREBY GRANTS Defendant's motion (D.E. 13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/6/2022. (MM)cc: COR (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#12

(#12) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reliastar Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Voya Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Voya Financial, Inc. for Reliastar Life Insurance Company.. (Turner, Ann) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#11

(#11) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#10

(#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent H-Food Holdings, LLC for Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC.. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#9

(#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#8

(#8) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent H-Food Holdings, LLC for Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC.. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Leslie Sanders. #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(JLC)cc: COR (Entered: 04/15/2022)

3 #2

Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC

3 #1

Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan

3 #3

Main Document

1 #4

Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC

1 #2

Summons Reliastar Life Insurance Company

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robyn Anderson: Having determined that these filings meet the requirements in Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2, the Court HEREBY GRANTS Defendant's motion (D.E. 13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/6/2022. (MM)cc: COR (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #13 MOTION for Robyn Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliastar Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5281565) (SYD) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Robyn L. Anderson re #13 MOTION for Robyn Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliastar Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5281565). (SYD) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAttorney Update. Attorney Robyn L. Anderson for Reliastar Life Insurance Company added. (SYD) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Robyn Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliastar Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5281565)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Robyn Anderson, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Turner, Ann) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reliastar Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Voya Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Voya Financial, Inc. for Reliastar Life Insurance Company.. (Turner, Ann) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent H-Food Holdings, LLC for Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC.. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent H-Food Holdings, LLC for Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC.. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: District Judge Wier has referred this matter to the undersigned to direct the parties to "timely conduct a Rule 26(f) conference," and establish a schedule, among other things. D.E. 4 at 1-2. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, the Court ORDERS as follows: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: see a. - e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent)(MM)cc: COR (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Leslie Sanders. #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan. (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(JLC)cc: COR (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan, Reliastar Life Insurance Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan, #2 Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC)(JLC) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLC) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5243443), filed by Robin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Reliastar Life Insurance Company, #3 Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC Insurance Plan, #4 Summons Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC)(JLC) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIASTAR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Michelle Turner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie Goff Sanders