This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:49:12 (UTC).

Baker v. McCarley et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Baker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against McCarley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01169

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Deshawn Baker

Salem, OR 97317

Defendants

James Welsh

Kevin McCarley

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (dsg) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 6:20-cv-01169-AC. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 7/29/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Form IFP and this Order Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/29/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/21/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Complaint. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker against Kevin McCarley, James Welsh (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (dsg) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 6:20-cv-01169-AC. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 7/29/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Form IFP and this Order Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/29/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/21/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker against Kevin McCarley, James Welsh (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less