This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2020 at 07:38:28 (UTC).

BAKER v. JONES et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 BAKER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND, STEPHEN HYLES, LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CLAY D LAND

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

Referral Judges

STEPHEN HYLES

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVERY DANIELLE BAKER

Americus, GA 31709

Defendants

Lieutenant WAKEFIELD

Sergeant WRIGHT

Sergeant THOMAS

Commissioner CLAY JONES

Captain MASON

Colonel ERIC BRYANT

Officer ADAM

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by AVERY DANIELLE BAKER against ADAM, ERIC BRYANT, CLAY JONES, MASON, THOMAS, WAKEFIELD, and WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Avery Danielle Baker. Copy of docket sheet sent to Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by AVERY DANIELLE BAKER (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement)(tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AVERY DANIELLE BAKER (bcl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Avery Danielle Baker. Copy of docket sheet sent to Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AVERY DANIELLE BAKER (bcl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF added. US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES and US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case. (bcl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer to Case # 1:19-cv-210 (tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#3) This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Albany Division Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4(tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by AVERY DANIELLE BAKER (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement)(tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by AVERY DANIELLE BAKER against ADAM, ERIC BRYANT, CLAY JONES, MASON, THOMAS, WAKEFIELD, and WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.