This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2019 at 07:48:54 (UTC).

BAKER v. JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 BAKER filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND and STEPHEN HYLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGER LEE BAKER, JR

Nicholls, GA 31554

Defendants

John William Johnson, Jr.

BOBBY G PETERS

 

Court Documents

10 #4

Envelope - Back

10 #3

Envelope - Front

10 #2

Cover Letter

10 #1

State Criminal Case Documents

#10

(#10) THIRD SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint and Request for Warrants as to John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 State Criminal Case Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope - Front, #4 Envelope - Back)(tlp) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Letter from Plaintiff regarding copies to be returned. Note left for case manager to check upon her return (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) SECOND SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint/Objections against John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

7 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Plaintiff's opinions re: state court

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's opinions re: state court, #2 Envelope)(tlp) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (esl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER transferring this case to the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/2/19. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roger Lee Baker, Jr.(jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/01/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) THIRD SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint and Request for Warrants as to John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 State Criminal Case Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope - Front, #4 Envelope - Back)(tlp) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Plaintiff regarding copies to be returned. Note left for case manager to check upon her return (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SECOND SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint/Objections against John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against John William Johnson, Jr, BOBBY G PETERS by ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's opinions re: state court, #2 Envelope)(tlp) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROGER LEE BAKER, JR (esl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added. Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER transferring this case to the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/2/19. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Lee Baker, Jr. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roger Lee Baker, Jr.(jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.