This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 08:25:30 (UTC).

Baker v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Baker filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03197

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Baker

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Stanford Law

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP-Denver

P. O. Box 8749555 17Th Street

Denver, CO 80201-8749

Sean Bradley Leventhal

Attorney at Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan

3200 Cherry Creek South Drivesuite 520

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes, P.C.

9200 East Mineral Avenuesuite 330

Centennial, CO 80112

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes, P.C.

7300 East Caley Avenuesuite 300

Centennial, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Elaine Baker All parties do not consent.. (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Elaine Baker. (Law, David) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Sean B. Leventhal by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Elaine BakerAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Elaine Baker(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#14

(#14) Defendant Allstate's ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for David S. Law by David Stanford Law on behalf of Elaine BakerAttorney David Stanford Law added to party Elaine Baker(pty:pla) (Law, David) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 30 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#2

(#4) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #2 Notice of Entry of Appearance and #1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorneys Winslow R. Taylor, III and Kurt H. Henkel. The s/signatures did not match the filers' names on the accounts for which the logins and passwords are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE ORDER In light of 20 Case Reassigned, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 is VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/24/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03197-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Elaine Baker All parties do not consent.. (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney David Stanford Law. Attorney Law is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Law as counsel of record, and to remove his name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Plaintiff shall continue to be represented by Attorney Sean B. Leventhal. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/29/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Elaine Baker. (Law, David) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #13 Notice of Entry of Appearance & #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneys Sean Bradley Leventhal & David Stanford Law. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Sean B. Leventhal by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Elaine BakerAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Elaine Baker(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant Allstate's ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for David S. Law by David Stanford Law on behalf of Elaine BakerAttorney David Stanford Law added to party Elaine Baker(pty:pla) (Law, David) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 30 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#10) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company with attach by Denver County District Court Judge Darryl F. Shockley on 11/5/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand, Delay Reduction Order, Pre-Trial Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Three-Week Extension of Time to Serve Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, and Order Granting Motion upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 10/28/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Three-Week Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by Denver County District Court Judge Darryl F. Shockley on 10/6/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Elaine Baker.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #2 Notice of Entry of Appearance and #1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorneys Winslow R. Taylor, III and Kurt H. Henkel. The s/signatures did not match the filers' names on the accounts for which the logins and passwords are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver County - District, Case Number 2021CV032507. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8197817), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel