This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:17:47 (UTC).

Baker-Ottem v. Goodhue County et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Baker-Ottem filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Goodhue County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem

Faribault, MN 55021

Defendants

C.O. John Doe

C.O. Jane Doe

C.O. Steve Schrelber

C.O. Tabitha Manke

Lt. John Doe

Good Hue County

Srg. John Doe

Goodhue County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew A. Wolf

Attorney at Iverson Reuvers Condon

9321 Ensign Ave. S.

Bloomington, MN 55438

Jason M Hiveley

Attorney at Iverson Reuvers Condon

9321 Ensign Ave S

Bloomington, MN 55438

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goodhue County. (Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Goodhue County, Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. Jointly Signed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem.(Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. (Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#8

(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Removal

#7

(#7) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/5/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Consent Form) (TJB). (cc: Pltf) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 02/05/2019)

1 #3

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Goodhue County, case number 25-cv-18-1771 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6628536) filed by All Defendants. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wolf, Andrew) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#12

(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/19/2019. (TJB) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

5 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 7/12/2019. Motions (disp) due by 8/5/2019. Ready for trial due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/19/2019. (TJB) (cc: Pltf) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/19/2019. (TJB) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#11) (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation & Resetting of Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (TJB) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Goodhue County, Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. Jointly Signed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem.(Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #7 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 02/26/2019. (TJB) (cc: Baker-Ottem) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/5/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Consent Form) (TJB). (cc: Pltf) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (cc: NEF Pltf) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. (Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-186 (WMW/DTS).(lmb) cc: Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goodhue County. (Wolf, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Goodhue County, case number 25-cv-18-1771 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6628536) filed by All Defendants. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wolf, Andrew) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.