This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 07:11:22 (UTC).

Baker et al v. Watervliet Public Schools et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Baker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Watervliet Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stacey Nicole Baker

Stefanie Brule

Angela Roberts

Karen Garlanger

Defendants

Watervliet Public Schools

Ric Seager

Watervliet Board of Education

Greg Eding

Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education

St. Joseph Public Schools

Jenny Fee

Lakeshore Public Schools

St. Joseph Public Schools Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Andrew Thomas, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of James A. Thomas

1925 Breton Rd., Ste. 250

Grand Rapids, MI 49506

Defendant Attorney

Travis Mark Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

101 W Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Fl.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Berrien County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (ems) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Berrien County Circuit Court (ems) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Count IX and remanding case to state court; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing the federal claim and remanding to state court by defendants Jenny Fee, Lakeshore Public Schools, Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education, Ric Seager, St. Joseph Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools Board of Education, Watervliet Board of Education, Watervliet Public Schools (Comstock, Travis) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ems). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

4 #5

State Court Document(s) - Part 5 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint Continued)

4 #4

State Court Document(s) - Part 4 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint)

4 #3

State Court Document(s) - Part 3 of 5 (State Court Summons and Pleadings)

4 #2

State Court Document(s) - Part 2 of 5 (Notice of Removal Continued)

4 #1

State Court Document(s) - Part 1 of 5 (Notice of Removal)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT FILE received from Berrien County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Document(s) - Part 1 of 5 (Notice of Removal), #2 State Court Document(s) - Part 2 of 5 (Notice of Removal Continued), #3 State Court Document(s) - Part 3 of 5 (State Court Summons and Pleadings), #4 State Court Document(s) - Part 4 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint), #5 State Court Document(s) - Part 5 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint Continued)) (ems) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#3

(#3) WRIT OF CERTIORARI; 2nd Circuit Court to transmit entire state court file by 2/18/2022; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - Motion for Immediate Declaratory Relief

1 #5

Exhibit 4 - Motion for TRO or Show Cause

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Exhibits D-G

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal

1 #1

Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berrien County Circuit Court case number 2022-0014-CZ-H filed by Ric Seager, Watervliet Board of Education, Jenny Fee, Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education, Greg Eding, Lakeshore Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools Board of Education, Watervliet Public Schools (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Exhibits A-C, #4 Exhibit 3 - Exhibits D-G, #5 Exhibit 4 - Motion for TRO or Show Cause, #6 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Immediate Declaratory Relief, #7 Exhibit 6 - Civil Cover Sheet) (Comstock, Travis) Modified text and filers on 2/16/2022 (ems). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Berrien County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (ems) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Berrien County Circuit Court (ems) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Count IX and remanding case to state court; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing the federal claim and remanding to state court by defendants Jenny Fee, Lakeshore Public Schools, Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education, Ric Seager, St. Joseph Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools Board of Education, Watervliet Board of Education, Watervliet Public Schools (Comstock, Travis) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ems). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT FILE received from Berrien County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Document(s) - Part 1 of 5 (Notice of Removal), #2 State Court Document(s) - Part 2 of 5 (Notice of Removal Continued), #3 State Court Document(s) - Part 3 of 5 (State Court Summons and Pleadings), #4 State Court Document(s) - Part 4 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint), #5 State Court Document(s) - Part 5 of 5 (Original State Court Complaint Continued)) (ems) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Berrien County Circuit Court (ems) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WRIT OF CERTIORARI; 2nd Circuit Court to transmit entire state court file by 2/18/2022; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for declaratory judgment on Count I, Count II, Count III, Count IV, Count V, Count VI, Count VII, and Count X of the Complaint (as taken from Notice of Removal #1 , Attachment #6) by plaintiffs Stacey Nicole Baker, Stacey Nicole Baker, Stefanie Brule, Stefanie Brule, Karen Garlanger, Karen Garlanger, Angela Roberts, Angela Roberts; (ems) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for temporary restraining order or in the alternative motion for an order to show cause (as taken from Notice of Removal #1 , Attachment #5) by plaintiffs Stacey Nicole Baker, Stacey Nicole Baker, Stefanie Brule, Stefanie Brule, Karen Garlanger, Karen Garlanger, Angela Roberts, Angela Roberts; (ems) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Greg Eding, Jenny Fee, Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education, Lakeshore Public Schools, Stevensville, MI, Ric Seager, St. Joseph Public Schools, Watervliet Board of Education, Watervliet Public Schools in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6669167 (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berrien County Circuit Court case number 2022-0014-CZ-H filed by Ric Seager, Watervliet Board of Education, Jenny Fee, Lakeshore Public Schools Board of Education, Greg Eding, Lakeshore Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools, St. Joseph Public Schools Board of Education, Watervliet Public Schools (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Exhibits A-C, #4 Exhibit 3 - Exhibits D-G, #5 Exhibit 4 - Motion for TRO or Show Cause, #6 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Immediate Declaratory Relief, #7 Exhibit 6 - Civil Cover Sheet) (Comstock, Travis) Modified text and filers on 2/16/2022 (ems). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less