This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 10:51:32 (UTC).

Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC et al v. Richard Mumby

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Richard Mumby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10436

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC

DSAM + MASTER FUND

DSAM Plus Master Fund

Defendant

Richard Mumby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela L Dunning

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130

Alexander George Galicki

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Mark L. Garibyan

Attorney at Schulte Roth and Zabel LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

William H. Gussman, Jr.

Attorney at Schulte Roth and Zabel LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Paul R. Fine

Attorney at Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch and Lebovits LLP

1801 Century Park East 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2332

Defendant Attorneys

Ekwan E Rhow

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg and Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561

David I. Hurwitz

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg and Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Richard Lawrence Gallagher

Attorney at Kaufhold Gaskin Gallagher LLP

3888 Market Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#31

29 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

#29

#28

27 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

#27

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

#25

5 #3

Redacted Document

5 #2

Redacted Document

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/26/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case #29 , noticed for hearing on 03/15/2021 at 9:00 am, HAS BEEN ADVANCED TO 02/16/2021 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Richard Mumby. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #27 , for the following reasons: Memorandum of Points and Authorities contains single-spaced text. LR 11-3.6. Defendant may refile the opposition not later than 10 am on January 6, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 28 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Richard Mumby. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Hurwitz, David) Modified on 1/5/2021 (lom). (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 11/13/2020, receipt number ACACDC-29010511), filed by plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM Plus Master Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT AND THE CONTRACT UNDER SEAL #5 . (lc) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Richard Mumby answer now due 1/4/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Richard Mumby.(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Richard Mumby, identifying Plaintiff Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC; Plaintiff DSAM + Master Fund; Defendant Richard Mumby; Bailey Capital Management LLC. (Attorney David I. Hurwitz added to party Richard Mumby(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #17 #19 Non-Resident Attorney Mark Garibyan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff DSAM + Master Fund, designating Paul R. Fine as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William H. Gussman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff DSAM + MASTER FUND (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29017634) filed by Plaintiff DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fine, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DSAM + MASTER FUND, (Attorney Paul R Fine added to party DSAM + MASTER FUND(pty:pla))(Fine, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document Complaint and Exhibit A under seal #5 filed by Plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Complaint, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document Complaint and Exhibit A under seal filed by Plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document)(Attorney Angela L Dunning added to party DSAM + MASTER FUND(pty:pla))(Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC (Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29010511 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC, DSAM + MASTER FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Angela L Dunning added to party Bailey Venture Partners XXI, LLC(pty:pla))(Dunning, Angela) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L. Gallagher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David I Hurwitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ekwan E Rhow