This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:49:42 (UTC).

Bailey v. W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Bailey filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against W D Wright Contracting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Bailey

Defendants

Wright Traffic Control, Inc.

W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew P Kimble

Attorney at Biller & Kimble, LLC Of Counsel

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Michael C. Groh

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael P. Murphy, Jr.

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wright Traffic Control, Inc. on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Groh

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Murphy

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7315487) of Michael Murphy, Jr., Michael Groh by Plaintiff William Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Murphy, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Groh) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for William Bailey

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff William Bailey of Consent to Join Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for William Bailey) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for Joshua Bailey

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff William Bailey of Consent to Join Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for Joshua Bailey) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wright Traffic Control, Inc. on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Murphy, Jr. and Michael Groh as CO-COUNSEL is this matter ONLY. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/5/2020. (ss) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7315487) of Michael Murphy, Jr., Michael Groh by Plaintiff William Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Murphy, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Groh) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff William Bailey of Consent to Join Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for William Bailey) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff William Bailey of Consent to Join Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Form for Joshua Bailey) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc., Wright Traffic Control, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7266929), filed by William Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kimble, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER GROH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew P Kimble

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.