This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2023 at 07:41:16 (UTC).

Bailey v. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Bailey filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Bailey

Defendants

G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Clifton Gordon

Austin W. Anderson

Carter T. Hastings

William Clifton Alexander

Lauren E. Braddy

Defendant Attorneys

John Stuart Collins

Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Phillip Bailey. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. and Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. (zv) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Bailey. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. served on 12/15/2022, answer due 1/5/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc..(Collins, John) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc..(Collins, John) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Bailey. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. served on 12/15/2022, answer due 1/5/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. answer due 12/29/2022. (zv) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or to file Responsive Pleading) entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or to file Responsive Pleading) by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Collins, John) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. and Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. (zv) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Phillip Bailey. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16754171), filed by Phillip Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less