This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2021 at 07:38:57 (UTC).

Bailey v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Bailey filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07152

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathan Bailey

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Neal Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 W. Olympic Boulevard, Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Millard Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench, LLP

38 Discovery, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Scott S. Shepardson

Attorney at Ongaro PC

1604 Union Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Declaration of Matthew Proudfoot In Support of Notice of Removal

#2

#3

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) Motion to Substitute Counsel by Matthew Millard Proudfoot (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#7

(#7) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney..(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney..(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions - General > Substitute Attorney. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by FCA US LLC (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Substitute Counsel by Matthew Millard Proudfoot (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, search and enter all affiliates or corpor ate parents.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by FCA US LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC for FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Millard Proudfoot (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma. Their case number is SCV-268845. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16394560). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Matthew Proudfoot In Support of Notice of Removal)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Steven Shepardson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot