This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:36:12 (UTC).

Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Bailey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward B. Atkins and Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristi G Bailey

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Rocco Farnolo

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC - Melville

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 11747

Melville, NY 11747

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP - Atlanta

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Foster Bird

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200, P.O. Box 1856

Huntington, WV 25719

Megan Basham Davis

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200, P.O. Box 1856

Huntington, WV 25719

 

Court Documents

12 #7

Exhibit G - CMO No. 12

12 #6

Exhibit F - CMO No. 9

12 #5

Exhibit E - CMO No. 17

12 #4

Exhibit D - CMO No. 7

12 #3

Exhibit C - Pretrial Order No. 3

12 #2

Exhibit B - CMO No. 3

12 #1

Exhibit A - Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 3, #3 Exhibit C - Pretrial Order No. 3, #4 Exhibit D - CMO No. 7, #5 Exhibit E - CMO No. 17, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 9, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 12)(Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER: 1) W/in 14 days of the date of this Order, parties shall meet. 2) W/in 10 days of the meeting, parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/25/2020.(SCD)cc: COR (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#10

(#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Melissa Foster Bird. Notice #8 has been filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

7 #3

PHV Info

7 #2

Attorney Admission Packet

7 #1

ECF Registration Form

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Nicholas Rocco Farnolo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info)(CBD) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

6 #1

Certified copy pf Master Case 2:15-md-2641 Docket Sheet

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED COPY of TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH) re MDL No. 2641: In an updated report on the settlement status of cases, the parties identify more than 100 pending cases that are not likely to settle. (Filed as Docs. 21552 at 2, 21552-2 in USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641). These cases which were directly filed in the MDL will be transferred to appropriate districts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Signed by Senior Judge David G. Campbell on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified copy of Master Case USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641 Docket Sheet) NOTE: Please see attached Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to the MDL and this case. (CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 09/18/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Notice to Attorney Farnolo (CBD) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #12 Joint Status Report (SCD) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 3, #3 Exhibit C - Pretrial Order No. 3, #4 Exhibit D - CMO No. 7, #5 Exhibit E - CMO No. 17, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 9, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 12)(Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: 1) W/in 14 days of the date of this Order, parties shall meet. 2) W/in 10 days of the meeting, parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/25/2020.(SCD)cc: COR (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review and possible scheduling: #6 CERTIFIED COPY of TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH) re MDL No. 2641. (CBD) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Melissa Foster Bird. Notice #8 has been filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAttorney Update. Attorney Melissa Foster Bird,Megan Basham Davis for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (CBD) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Nicholas Rocco Farnolo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info)(CBD) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED COPY of TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH) re MDL No. 2641: In an updated report on the settlement status of cases, the parties identify more than 100 pending cases that are not likely to settle. (Filed as Docs. 21552 at 2, 21552-2 in USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641). These cases which were directly filed in the MDL will be transferred to appropriate districts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Signed by Senior Judge David G. Campbell on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified copy of Master Case USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641 Docket Sheet) NOTE: Please see attached Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to the MDL and this case. (CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:17-cv-04029. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. CC: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to any non-registered filer(s) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4029-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14819829 filed by Kristi G Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less