This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2020 at 09:30:24 (UTC).

Bailey v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Bailey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheryl Bailey

Hope Mills, NC 28348

Defendants

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Honda Motor Co., Ltd.

Home Depot USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher James Anglin

Attorney at Anglin Law Firm, PLLC

3824 Barrett Dr., Suite 301

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorney

Patrick James Cleary

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke, LLP

1441 Main St., Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Index for Exhibits to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Summons and Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Patrick J. Cleary

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Supplement North Carolina Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit A - Cumberland County Clerk's Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice

#7

#8

#9

#10

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 5/26/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 4/1/21. Mediation Deadline set for 2/12/21. Motions due by 5/1/21. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/5/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Disclosure Statement by Home Depot USA, Inc. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Correct Financial Disclosure Statements as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc. regarding #13 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Financial Disclosure Statement. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #15 ** Financial Disclosure Statement by Home Depot USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc., a Delaware Corporation for Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) Modified on 4/8/2020 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) HOME DEPOT USA, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) Modified on 4/2/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/1/20. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/27/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Service filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. regarding Notice to Counsel, Certificate of Service for #6 American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Notice of Filing State Court Acknowledgement of the Filing Copy of Notice of Removal. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice. A Certificate of Service should accompany this filing for service on counsel that have not yet appeared and therefore cannot receive documents via CM/ECF. Counsel is directed to file the Certificate of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Notice of Filing Acknowledgement of the Filing Copy of Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cumberland County Clerk's Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal) (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) American Honda Motor Co, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Cleary, Patrick) Modified on 3/16/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel Christopher J. Anglin of Anglin Law Firm, PLLC at P. O. Box 91476, Raleigh, NC 27675 mailed via US Mail on March 12, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 ** Financial Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) Modified on 4/8/2020 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL077540 (Rodriguez, M.) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 19CVS7566. ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index for Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Patrick J. Cleary, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement North Carolina Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA MOTOR COMPANY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick James Cleary