This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 09:07:31 (UTC).

Bailey et al v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Bailey filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer CropScience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00812

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Lyle Bailey

Defendants

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Corteva Inc.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Syngenta Corporation

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

CHS Inc.

Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene

55 Cambridge Parkway, Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Lauren Guth Barnes

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN LLP - Cambridge

55 Cambridge Pkwy., Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Thomas M. Sobol

Attorney at HAGENS AND BERMAN - Cambridge

One Main Street, Fourth Floor

Cambridge, MA 02142

Daniel J. Kurowski

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN SOBOL

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Drive, Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Abbye R. K. Ognibene

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN LLP - Cambridge

55 Cambridge Pkwy., Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

 

Court Documents

#24

31 #1

*Restricted*

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SEP et al.(Echols, Barack) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00512. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DLB) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri and MDL 2993 In Re: Crop Inputs Antitrust Litigation.(kek) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). (kek) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bayer CropScience LP waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Corteva Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CHS Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. BASF Corporation waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) Modified service date as per document on 6/8/2021 (lmb). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Winfield Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cargill Incorporated waiver sent on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Ognibene, Abbye) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Guth Barnes ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas M Sobol ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490529 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ognibene, Abbye) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas M Sobol $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490471 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Guth Barnes $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490421 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnes, Lauren) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-512-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (trb) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Kurowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kurowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4489482.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant