This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:37 (UTC).

BAHL et al v. C.R. BARD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by BAHL against C R BARD, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17057

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Susan D. Wigenton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LISA M. BAHL

TIMOTHY M. BAHL

Defendants

C.R. BARD, INC.

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC..(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912087) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIMOTHY M. BAHL, LISA M. BAHL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, TAYJES) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. (MONAHAN, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/18/2019. (kd) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/18/2019. (kd) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. (MONAHAN, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC..(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912087) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIMOTHY M. BAHL, LISA M. BAHL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, TAYJES) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.