This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:17:08 (UTC).

BAHGAT v. ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 BAHGAT filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Trevor N. McFadden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02169

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mohamed Abdel Raouf Bahgat

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dan Tan

Attorney at DAN TAN LAW

305 Broadway, Suite 750

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

1 #10

Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

1 #9

Exhibit E to to Fietta Decl

1 #8

Exhibit D to Fietta Decl

1 #7

Exhibit C to Fietta Decl

1 #6

Exhibit B to Fietta Decl

1 #5

Exhibit A to Fietta Decl

1 #4

Declaration of Stephen Fietta

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit I to Petition to Confirm

#1

(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7439910) filed by Mohamed Abdel Raouf Bahgat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I to Petition to Confirm, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration of Stephen Fietta, #5 Exhibit A to Fietta Decl, #6 Exhibit B to Fietta Decl, #7 Exhibit C to Fietta Decl, #8 Exhibit D to Fietta Decl, #9 Exhibit E to to Fietta Decl, #10 Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Tan, Dan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/10/2020) (ztnr). (Entered: 08/08/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against ARAB REPUBLIC OF EGYPT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7439910) filed by Mohamed Abdel Raouf Bahgat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I to Petition to Confirm, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration of Stephen Fietta, #5 Exhibit A to Fietta Decl, #6 Exhibit B to Fietta Decl, #7 Exhibit C to Fietta Decl, #8 Exhibit D to Fietta Decl, #9 Exhibit E to to Fietta Decl, #10 Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Tan, Dan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/10/2020) (ztnr). (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less