This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 07:49:43 (UTC).

Baggett v. Keystone RV Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Baggett filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Keystone RV Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02795

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Allen Baggett

Defendants

Keystone RV Company

Camping World RV Sales, LLC

U.S. Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Collins Dalton

Attorney at Richard C. Dalton, LLC

P.O. Box 358

Carencro, LA 70520

Defendant Attorney

John William Arnold

Attorney at Bailey Crowe et al

901 Main St, Ste 6550

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank, National Association, filed.(Arnold, John) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by U.S. Bank, National Association, filed.(Arnold, John) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading ; Answer due for U.S. Bank, National Association 10/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading by U.S. Bank, National Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, John) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Arnold on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association, filed. (Arnold, John) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camping World RV Sales, LLC identifying CWGS Enterprises, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Arnold, John) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Camping World RV Sales, LLC, filed.(Arnold, John) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26955382) filed by Jonathan Allen Baggett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camping World RV Sales, LLC doing business as Camping World RV Sales - Jackson is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYSTONE RV COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W. Arnold