This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:22:55 (UTC).

Baer v. Wilson, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Baer filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01318

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William H Baer

Mansfield, OH 44901

Defendants

Karen Stanforth

Danny Hall

Kelly Rose

Dorene Burkhart

Mbanefo Ojukwu

Racheal Wheeler

Roger Wilson

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Financial Application

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) Complaint against Dorene Burkhart, Danny Hall, Mbanefo Ojukwu, Kelly Rose, Karen Stanforth, Racheal Wheeler, Roger Wilson. Filing fee not paid. Filed by William H Baer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Y,A) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Supplement Civil Cover Sheet filed by William H Baer. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

4 #1

Docket Sheet

#3

(#3) Order. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the full filing fee of $400.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not have the funds in his prisoner account to pay the full filing fee, he is ordered to complete and submit the entire Financial Application accompanying this Order, including a certified account statement from the correctional institution, within 30 (thirty) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 6/20/2019. (Related document #1 ) (Attachments: #1 Financial Application) (S,S) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Notice of Compliance filed by William H Baer. (Related document(s) #3 ).(Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Check Out-Slip, #3 Envelope) (H,SP) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

4 #2

Check Out-Slip

4 #3

Envelope

1 #3

USM-285

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Compliance filed by William H Baer. (Related document(s) #3 ).(Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Check Out-Slip, #3 Envelope) (H,SP) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #3 Order mailed to William H Baer, #565-582, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 6/20/2019. (S,S) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the full filing fee of $400.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not have the funds in his prisoner account to pay the full filing fee, he is ordered to complete and submit the entire Financial Application accompanying this Order, including a certified account statement from the correctional institution, within 30 (thirty) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 6/20/2019. (Related document #1 ) (Attachments: #1 Financial Application) (S,S) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Supplement Civil Cover Sheet filed by William H Baer. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint against Dorene Burkhart, Danny Hall, Mbanefo Ojukwu, Kelly Rose, Karen Stanforth, Racheal Wheeler, Roger Wilson. Filing fee not paid. Filed by William H Baer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Y,A) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.