This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:32:29 (UTC).

Baer et al v. The Kroger Company

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Baer filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against The Kroger Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. McFarland and Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Matthew W. McFarland

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tito Torres, Jr

Michelle Patraw

Chennetta Schoefield

Terry Cavanaugh

Evan Baer

Defendant

The Kroger Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Richard Karon

Attorney at Karon LLC

700 W. St. Clair Avenue, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Beau D Hollowell

700 W. St. Clair Avenue, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorney

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#14

#3

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/26/2021. to Reply in Support of A Stay ( Responses due by 7/23/2021) by Defendants The Kroger Company, The Kroger Company, The Kroger Company, The Kroger Company, The Kroger Company, The Kroger Co., The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Stay) Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00146-TSB et al. (Lampley, Nathaniel) Modified Event Type on 7/6/2021 (bjc). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel ( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Plaintiffs Evan Baer, Terry Cavanaugh, Michelle Patraw, Chennetta Schoefield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Leadership Application and Opposition to Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit Grille Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration - Girard Sharp CV, #4 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion, #5 Exhibit Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00146-TSB et al. (Karon, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/22/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland and Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/20/2021. The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 1:21-cv-146; 1:21-cv-174; 1:21-cv-198; 1:21-cv-226; 1:21-cv-240; 1:21-cv-279 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kl) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants on 5/14/2021; answer due 7/13/2021. (Karon, Daniel) Modified docket text to include service details on 5/18/2021 (eh). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Kroger Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8310844), filed by Chennetta Schoefield, Evan Baer, Michelle Patraw, Terry Cavanaugh, Tito Torres, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Kroger Civil Cover Sheet) (Karon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.