This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:02:18 (UTC).

BAE Systems Resolution Inc., et al v. Mission Transport, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 BAE Systems Resolution Inc filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Mission Transport, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00974

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flint CPS Inks Holdings LLC

Defendants

Lee Roy Meadows

Baumann Auto Repair, Inc.

Nielsen's Garage

R&L Carriers, Inc.

Ismail Ali

Tress, Inc.

Louis F Sirianni

MAAC Enterprises, Inc.

Auto Works, Inc.

Southern Moving & Storage Company, Inc.

San Marcos Truck Stop

Comet Fuel Center, Inc.

The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.

Zamarripa's Tire

Ewald Kubota, Inc.

Mitson, Inc.

AAMCO Transmissions

Sirianni Automotive

Schneider's Tire & Automotive Service, Inc.

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Edward Smith

Attorney at Crain Caton & James

Five Houston Center, 1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77010

Kelly D. Brown

Attorney at Crain Caton & James

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Caroline Carter Pace

Attorney at Crain Caton & James

1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BAE Systems Resolution Inc.. (Pace, Caroline) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rogers Import Service, LLC.(rg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Structural Metals, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PerkinElmer Automotive Research, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flint CPS Inks Holdings LLC. (Smith, James) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Smith, James) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Smith, James) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly D. Brown for BAE Systems Resolution Inc.,Kelly D. Brown for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC,Kelly D. Brown for Exxon Mobil Corporation,Kelly D. Brown for Flint CPS Inks Holdings LLC,Kelly D. Brown for PerkinElmer Automotive Research, Inc.,Kelly D. Brown for Structural Metals, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Carter Pace for Kelly D. Brown ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12466292) by on behalf of BAE Systems Resolution Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Flint CPS Inks Holdings LLC, PerkinElmer Automotive Research, Inc., Structural Metals, Inc.. (Pace, Caroline) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12465624). No Summons requested at this time, filed by BAE Systems Resolution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pace, Caroline) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAAC Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where R+L CARRIERS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS- MANNY & JACK OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant