This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:08:55 (UTC).

Badger v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Badger filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee P. Rudofsky and Patricia S. Harris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

Referral Judge

Patricia S. Harris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craytonia Badger

Marianna, AR 72360

Defendants

Anthony Jackson

Gaylon Lay

Dexter Payne

K Randle

Davis

Armstrong

Deborah L Goodwin

Roosevelt Barden

M Kelley

Addison

Horner

Doe

Alandria Mitchell

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craytonia Badger. (kdr) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craytonia Badger.(kdr) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Amend 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Complaint Form by Craytonia Badger. (kdr) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Add Second Amended Complaint by Craytonia Badger. (llg) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; assessing an initial partial filing fee of $229.67; directing the initial partial filing fee and monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; denying #3 and #4 motions for leave to amend/add amended complaint without prejudice; directing the Clerk of Court to send Badger a blank 1983 form; and directing Badger to use the blank 1983 form to amend his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 05/04/2022. (llg) (Docket text modified on 5/5/2022 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #6 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #6 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Craytonia Badger. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner Plaintiffs. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the #3 and #4 motions were denied without prejudice as marked on the Order. (jak) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; assessing an initial partial filing fee of $229.67; directing the initial partial filing fee and monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; denying #3 and #4 motions for leave to amend/add amended complaint without prejudice; directing the Clerk of Court to send Badger a blank 1983 form; and directing Badger to use the blank 1983 form to amend his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 05/04/2022. (llg) (Docket text modified on 5/5/2022 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Add Second Amended Complaint by Craytonia Badger. (llg) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Amend 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Complaint Form by Craytonia Badger. (kdr) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craytonia Badger.(kdr) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craytonia Badger. (kdr) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADDISON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Armstrong is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVIS(D) is a litigant