This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:50:09 (UTC).

BAD Holdings, LLC v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 BAD Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00427

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAD Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew V Fisher

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nich

111 East Kilbourn Avenue, 19Th Floor

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. All Defendants. (Fisher, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., filed by BAD Holdings, LLC. (Fisher, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due 7/21/2021. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/7/2021. (arw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (voc) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2898451) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Matthew) Modified on 6/30/2021: Deleted addresses of both parties. (lak) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **In response to this court's jurisdiction order (dkt. #3 ), plaintiff BAD Holdings, LLC has filed an amended complaint (dkt. #4 ). The court is satisfied that plaintiff has now adequately alleged that there is complete diversity of citizenship and the amount in controversy is greater than $75,000, so the court will exercise jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 barring contradictory evidence. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/20/2021. (arw) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. All Defendants. (Fisher, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., filed by BAD Holdings, LLC. (Fisher, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due 7/21/2021. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/7/2021. (arw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (voc) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2898451) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Matthew) Modified on 6/30/2021: Deleted addresses of both parties. (lak) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew V Fisher