This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2020 at 10:36:51 (UTC).

Backus v. I.Q. Data International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 Backus filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against I Q Data International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00215

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Backus

Defendants

Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC

Gaines Investment Trust

I.Q. Data International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Dwayne Hallett

Attorney at Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma Inc

907 S Detroit Ave #725

Tulsa, OK 74120

Teressa LaVerne Webster

Attorney at Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma Inc (Muskogee)

624 W Broadway

Muskogee, OK 74401

Defendant Attorney

Deric James McClellan

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (Tulsa)

321 S Boston Ave Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Gaines Investment Trust, Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC (McClellan, Deric) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Deric James McClellan on behalf of Gaines Investment Trust, Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC [Note: Attorney Deric James McClellan added to party Gaines Investment Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Deric James McClellan added to party Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC(pty:dft).] (McClellan, Deric) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Gaines Investment Trust Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Teressa LaVerne Webster on behalf of Joseph Backus [Note: Attorney Teressa LaVerne Webster added to party Joseph Backus(pty:pla).] (Webster, Teressa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric Dwayne Hallett on behalf of Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Joseph Backus (With attachments) (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Gaines Investment Trust, Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC (McClellan, Deric) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Deric James McClellan on behalf of Gaines Investment Trust, Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC [Note: Attorney Deric James McClellan added to party Gaines Investment Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Deric James McClellan added to party Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC(pty:dft).] (McClellan, Deric) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Tulsa Greenbriar I, LLC Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Gaines Investment Trust Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Teressa LaVerne Webster on behalf of Joseph Backus [Note: Attorney Teressa LaVerne Webster added to party Joseph Backus(pty:pla).] (Webster, Teressa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric Dwayne Hallett on behalf of Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Joseph Backus (With attachments) (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Joseph Backus (Hallett, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where I.Q. Data International, Inc. is a litigant