This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 07:54:53 (UTC).

BackGrid USA, Inc. v. Sildan Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 BackGrid USA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Sildan Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder, Mark C. Scarsi and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07661

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BackGrid USA, Inc.

Defendant

Sildan Corporation a Florida corporation doing business as Illesteva

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna Ardalan

One Llp, 9301 Wilshire Boulevard Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Peter R Afrasiabi

One Llp, East Tower

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sildan Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07661 MCS(KESx). (rn) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#13

(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07661 MCS(KESx). (rn) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sildan Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,,, #5 filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32048625 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party BackGrid USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sildan Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BackGrid USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joanna Ardalan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter R Afrasiabi