This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2021 at 07:09:16 (UTC).

BackGrid USA, Inc. v. Haute Living Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 BackGrid USA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Haute Living Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06543

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BackGrid USA, Inc.

Defendants

Haute Living Inc.

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna Ardalan

One Llp, 9301 Wilshire Boulevard Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Peter R Afrasiabi

One Llp, East Tower

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Michael M. Kowsari

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

4695 Macarthur Court, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Nicholas Duane Myers

Attorney at Myers Law Group

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 9/14/2021, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution #12 (the OSC). On 9/30/2021 and 10/1/2021, Plaintiff filed a Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint #13 and a Response to OSC #14 . The Court deems those documents satisfactory responses and DISCHARGES the OSC. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.to Order to Show Cause,, #12 (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Haute Living Inc. answer now due 10/18/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc..(Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than OCTOBER 1, 2021. BY DEFENDANT: RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT OR BY PLAINTIFF: APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by October 1, 2021 will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., upon Defendant Haute Living Inc. served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon April Donaldson - Senior Vice President in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Haute Living Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc., (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31799022 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff BackGrid USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party BackGrid USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ardalan, Joanna) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAUTE LIVING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BackGrid USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Morteza Kowsari

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Duane Myers