This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:05:40 (UTC).

Backertop Licensing LLC v. Wyze Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Backertop Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wyze Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00570

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Backertop Licensing LLC

Defendant

Wyze Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,332,385 ;9,65,617 ;10,477,011 ;10,728,382. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Backertop Licensing LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Backertop Licensing LLC. Wyze Labs, Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 24, 2022 - filed by Wyze Labs, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2022 - filed by Wyze Labs, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2022, filed by Wyze Labs, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Wyze Labs, Inc. answer due 7/23/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/23/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2022 - filed by Wyze Labs, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 24, 2022, filed by Wyze Labs, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Wyze Labs, Inc. answer due 6/24/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/24/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 24, 2022 - filed by Wyze Labs, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Backertop Licensing LLC. Wyze Labs, Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00570-CFC, 1:22-cv-00572-CFC, 1:22-cv-00573-CFC, 1:22-cv-00574-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Backertop Licensing LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,332,385 ;9,65,617 ;10,477,011 ;10,728,382. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Wyze Labs, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3862355.) - filed by Backertop Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYZE LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis