This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 17:49:26 (UTC).

Back et al v. General Motors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Back filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Ludington and Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11372

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judge

Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Duane Roberts

James Flowers

Simon Semonin

Ronald Dufrene

Matthew Rogers

Lisa Carpenter

Diana Storer

Donna Shoemaker

Victor Riley

Mitch Henderson

Dennis Kinney

Connie Ramey

Daniel Chambers

Alan Hissam

Kenneth Brown

Scott Stowers

Denver Rice

Jason Farkas

Michael Cool

Defendant

General Motors LLC

94 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Wade Miller

Attorney at Heygood, Orr & Bearson

6363 N. State Highway 161, Suite 450

Irvin, TX 75038

Richard C. Sheppard

Attorney at Smith & Brooker

703 Washington Avenue

Bay City, MI 48708

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Cooney

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

400 Renaissance Center

Detroit, MI 48243

Renee D. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Katherine W. Warner

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Other Attorneys

Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr.

Attorney at Cleary, Gottlieb,

One Liberty Plaza, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Jonathan E. Lauderbach

Attorney at Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP

715 E. Main Street, Suite 110

Midland, MI 48640

William R. Jansen

Attorney at Warner, Norcross,

2000 Town Center, Suite 2700

Southfield, MI 48075-1222

Matthew D. Slater

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

2112 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *01/15/20*. Designated lead case number is *17-11661*. (DPer) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER consolidating cases (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (DPer) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#20

(#20) Order Vacating #15 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

17 #4

Exhibit 3 - Order RE Bellwether Process

17 #3

Exhibit 2 - Order RE Deposition Transcripts

#17

(#17) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order RE Access to Rational Database, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order RE Deposition Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order RE Bellwether Process) (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER to Show Cause. Written Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, and General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Cooney on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Cooney, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine W. Warner on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Warner, Katherine) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee D. Smith on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

4 #1

Proof of Service

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019; Robert Bosch LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#1

(#14) STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Defendant General Motors LLC and Robert Bosch LLC's Response Date re #1 Complaint. (Response due by 9/6/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *01/15/20*. Designated lead case number is *17-11661*. (DPer) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER consolidating cases (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (DPer) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order Vacating #15 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order RE Access to Rational Database, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order RE Deposition Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order RE Bellwether Process) (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Sheppard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sheppard, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER to Show Cause. Written Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Defendant General Motors LLC and Robert Bosch LLC's Response Date re #1 Complaint. (Response due by 9/6/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Robert Bosch LLC (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan E. Lauderbach appearing on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Lauderbach, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, and General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Cooney on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Cooney, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine W. Warner on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Warner, Katherine) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee D. Smith on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019; Robert Bosch LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7232749 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court Eastern District of Michigan (Bay City), 1:17-cv-11661-TLL-PTM, Judge District Judge Thomas L. Ludington] (Miller, Charles) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lisa M Carpenter is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. Jansen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr.