This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 09:22:46 (UTC).

Martha Bacchus v. Belmont Village, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Martha Bacchus filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Belmont Village, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02379

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Bacchus

Defendants

Belmont Village, L.P.

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Nourmand

James Alexander De Sario

Defendant Attorneys

Kelley Marie Blasa Fox

Daniel David Spencer

Jeffrey Scott Ranen

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration of Leslie White

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Leslie White

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Leslie White

1 #4

Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Leslie Whitev

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P., identifying Plaintiff Martha Bacchus, Defendant Belmont Village, L.P., Belmont Village Holding, LLC, Belmont Three, LLC, Plaintiff's Counsel, The Nourmand Law Firm, APC, Defense Counsel, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P.. (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04827-GW (ASx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02379-GW (ASx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for May 23, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than May 16, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (bm) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P..(Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P.. (Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) Related Case(s): Los Angeles Superior Court Case Numbers 20STCV15572 and 20STCV22064 (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial to be determined, filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P... (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to July 28, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by July 25, 2022. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to July 28, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by July 25, 2022. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022

Docket(#13) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 05/23/2022 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial to be determined, filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P... (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P.. (Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) Related Case(s): Los Angeles Superior Court Case Numbers 20STCV15572 and 20STCV22064 (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P..(Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for May 23, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than May 16, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (bm) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04827-GW (ASx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02379-GW (ASx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Martha Bacchus, upon Defendant Belmont Village, L.P. served on 3/10/2022. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 03/24/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-4 AS EXHIBIT 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Belmont Village, L.P., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Martha Bacchus. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/22/22 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-2 AS EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P.. (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P., identifying Plaintiff Martha Bacchus, Defendant Belmont Village, L.P., Belmont Village Holding, LLC, Belmont Three, LLC, Plaintiff's Counsel, The Nourmand Law Firm, APC, Defense Counsel, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCV06621 Receipt No: ACACDC-33099027 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Belmont Village, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie White, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Leslie White, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Leslie White, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Leslie Whitev) (Attorney Kelley Marie Blasa Fox added to party Belmont Village, L.P.(pty:dft))(Fox, Kelley) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less