This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2021 at 18:16:05 (UTC).

Bacani v. AT&T Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Bacani filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01893

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorenzo Bacani

Defendant

AT&T Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Scott Erickson

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd, Ste Apt 1

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Zachary Schmoll

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lorenzo Bacani. AT&T Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Services, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8967098) filed by Lorenzo Bacani. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lorenzo Bacani. AT&T Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1893 ECT/TNL. (CLK) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Services, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8967098) filed by Lorenzo Bacani. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Scott Erickson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Schmoll