This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:27:56 (UTC).

Baca v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Baca filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Fouratt, James O. Browning and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judges

Gregory J. Fouratt

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro Jose Baca

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Feliz MariSol Martone

Attorney at Martone Law Firm, P.A.

111 Lomas Blvd., N.W., Suite 400

Albuqerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorney

Manuel Lucero

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Jose Baca. Social Security Administration served on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Jose Baca. Social Security Administration served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Jose Baca. Social Security Administration served on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8073111 re #1 Complaint filed by Pedro Jose Baca (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pedro Jose Baca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manuel Lucero