This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Baby-Cakes Studio LLC v. Robinson

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Baby-Cakes Studio LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katharine H. Parker and Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08779

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katharine H. Parker

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baby-Cakes Studio LLC

Defendant

Linetta Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Cossu

Attorney at Olsoff Cahill Cossu LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Richard Paul Stone

Attorney at Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC

205 South Salina Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Telephone Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Wednesday, January 27, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (Initial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/14/2020) (rro) Modified on 12/14/2020 (rro). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF REFERENCE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/14/2020) (js) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Bryant Johnson

8 #1

Exhibit Tribune article

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Linetta Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tribune article, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Bryant Johnson).(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Linetta Robinson served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Linetta Robinson..(vf) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linetta Robinson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linetta Robinson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Linetta Robinson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22242918)Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Telephone Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Wednesday, January 27, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (Initial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/14/2020) (rro) Modified on 12/14/2020 (rro). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REFERENCE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/14/2020) (js) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Linetta Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tribune article, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Bryant Johnson).(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Linetta Robinson served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Linetta Robinson..(vf) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linetta Robinson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul Cossu to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Cossu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $80,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linetta Robinson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Linetta Robinson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22242918)Document filed by Baby-Cakes Studio LLC..(Cossu, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less