This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2022 at 07:04:45 (UTC).

Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC et al v. HousingEZ, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HousingEZ, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06279

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC

HousingEZ, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan Mildred Schlesinger

Attorney at Meister Seelig & Fein LLP

125 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Robert Phillip Feinland

Attorney at Meister Seelig & Fein LLP

125 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Seth H. Ostrow

Attorney at Meister Seelig & Fein LLP

125 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman LLP

1 Penn Plz, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Chamber's Individual Rules

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Issued by HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada), HousingEZ, Inc.(New York). (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Yong Chen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada) served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(New York) served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Phillip Feinland on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Feinland, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth H. Ostrow on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ostrow, Seth) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

3 #1

Housing Canada summons

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #3

Proposed Summons HousingEZ (Canada)

1 #2

Proposed Summons HousingEZ (NY)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 3:00 p.m. on 1/18/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 1/14/2022. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/16/2021) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada) and HousingEZ, Inc.(New York) shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/16/2021. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Issued by HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada), HousingEZ, Inc.(New York). (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Yong Chen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada) served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(New York) served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Phillip Feinland on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Feinland, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth H. Ostrow on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ostrow, Seth) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada), HousingEZ, Inc.(New York). (Attachments: #1 Housing Canada summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HousingEZ, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15021727 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons HousingEZ (NY), #3 Proposed Summons HousingEZ (Canada), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E) (Schlesinger, Susan) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen