This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:53:22 (UTC).

Babcock, Samantha v. Generac Power Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Babcock, Samantha filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Generac Power Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara B. Crabb and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara B. Crabb

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha R. Babcock

Defendant

Generac Power Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy F. Scarr

Attorney at Amy F. Scarr, S.C.

131 W. Wilson St., Suite 900

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A. Johnson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

1243 N. 10Th Streetsuite 200

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Sarah James Platt

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

1243 N. 10Th Streetsuite 200

Milwaukee, WI 53205

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset for 7/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed Motion to Reschedule 7/20/21 Telephone Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Samantha R. Babcock. (Scarr, Amy) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah James Platt for Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc.. (Platt, Sarah) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER by Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Johnson for Defendant Generac Power Systems, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Generac Power Systems, Inc. served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Scarr, Amy) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Generac Power Systems, Inc. (rks) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (rks) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Generac Power Systems, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2875619.), filed by Samantha R Babcock. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Scarr, Amy) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAC POWER SYSTEMS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Johnson